Case Last Refreshed: 4 weeks ago
Villasenor Gonzalez, Margarita, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Pro Se, against Mejia Ortega, Jose Guillermo, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Denise L. Gentile presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 29, 2023 |
CategoryDivorce - Complaint |
Last RefreshedApril 06, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 05, 2024 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause OSC Re: Dismissal (Chambers Calendar, No Appearances Required) Judge: Gentile, Denise L) OSC Re: Dismissal (Chambers Calendar, No Appearances Required |
|
April 04, 2024 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Filing Doc ID# 16 [16] Complaint, Amended Complaint & Summons Returned |
|
March 28, 2024 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Mailing Doc ID# 15 [15] Certificate of Mailing |
|
March 21, 2024 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Mailing Doc ID# 13 [13] Certificate of Mailing (Publication) |
|
March 21, 2024 | Docket Event |
Order Doc ID# 14 [14] Order to Complete Service |
|
March 19, 2024 | Docket Event |
Complaint for Divorce Doc ID# 12 [12] Amended Complaint for Divorce and UCCJEA Declaration (With Children) |
|
March 14, 2024 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Resident Witness Doc ID# 11 [11] Affidavit of Resident Witness |
|
March 07, 2024 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Publication Doc ID# 10 [10] Affidavit of Publication |
|
February 12, 2024 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause Doc ID# 9 [9] Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal Pursuant to NRCP 4(e)(2) |
|
January 26, 2024 | Docket Event |
Order for Service by Publication Doc ID# 8 [8] Order for Service by Publication |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.