Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Sirut Reyes, Maria Victoria, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Pro Se, against Arias Perez, Angel Luis, represented by Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Dawn R. Throne presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeDawn R. Throne Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 18, 2023 |
CategoryDivorce - Complaint |
Last RefreshedJanuary 30, 2024 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 29, 2024 | Docket Event |
Uncontested Hearing Uncontested Setting Slip - Divorce Judge: Throne, Dawn R. |
|
January 29, 2024 | Docket Event |
Decree of Divorce Doc ID# 11 [11] Decree of Divorce |
|
January 19, 2024 | Docket Event |
Clerk's Notice of Hearing Doc ID# 10 [10] Clerk's Notice of Hearing |
|
January 18, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice of Seminar Completion EDCR 5.302 Doc ID# 9 [9] Notice of Seminar Completion EDCR 5.302 |
|
January 18, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice of Intent to Take Default Doc ID# 5 [5] Notice of Intention to Enter Default Judgment |
|
January 18, 2024 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Resident Witness Doc ID# 7 [7] Affidavit of Resident Witness |
|
January 18, 2024 | Docket Event |
Afft Support of Req for Summary Dispo for Decree of Divorce Doc ID# 8 [8] Affidavit in Support of Request for Summary Disposition of Decree |
|
January 18, 2024 | Docket Event |
Request for Summary Disposition of Uncontested Div/Ann Doc ID# 6 [6] Request for Summary Disposition of Decree |
|
November 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
Default Doc ID# 4 [4] DEFAULT |
|
September 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
Acceptance of Service Doc ID# 3 [3] Acceptance of Service |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.