Case Last Refreshed: 7 months ago
Cunningham, Danielle Cherie, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Pro Se, against Cunningham, Ronald Wade, Ii, represented by Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Mathew P. Harter presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMathew P. Harter Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 15, 2023 |
CategoryDivorce - Complaint |
Last RefreshedSeptember 27, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
Opposition to Motion to Set Aside Order Judgment and/or Default
Judge: Gaudet, Paul M. |
|
September 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion to Set Aside Defendant's Motion to Set Aside Order, Judgment and/or Default Judge: Gaudet, Paul M. |
|
September 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
Hearing Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Set Aside Order, Judgment and/or Default Judge: Gaudet, Paul M. |
|
September 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
Decision and Order Doc ID# 20 [20] Denying Motion to Set Aside |
|
September 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
Reply to Opposition Doc ID# 19 [19] Reply to Plaintiff's Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Set Aside Order, Judgment and/or Default |
|
August 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice Doc ID# 17 [17] Notice of Intent to Serve Subpoena |
|
August 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Opposition Doc ID# 15 [15] Opposition to Motion to Set Aside Order Judgment and/or Default |
|
August 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Subpoena Duces Tecum Doc ID# 18 [18] Subpoena Duces Tecum |
|
August 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Service Doc ID# 16 [16] Certificate of Service |
|
August 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Financial Disclosure Form Doc ID# 14 [14] General Financial Disclosure Form |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.