Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Mays, Melody Rose, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Pro Se, against Mays, Marcus Ronald, represented by Matthew J. Winters, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Lisa M. Kent presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeLisa M. Kent Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 13, 2021 |
CategoryDivorce - Complaint |
Last RefreshedDecember 05, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 04, 2023 | Docket Event |
Reply to Opposition Doc ID# 32 [32] Reply to Opposition |
|
December 04, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion Plaintiffs Motion for Permission to Relocate with a Minor Child Judge: McConnell, Regina M. |
|
December 04, 2023 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Service Doc ID# 33 [33] Certificate of Service |
|
December 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
Opposition Doc ID# 30 [30] Opposition to Motion for Permission to Relocate with a Minor Child |
|
December 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
Family Court Motion Opposition Fee Information Sheet Doc ID# 31 [31] Family Court Opposition Fee Information Sheet |
|
November 29, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance Doc ID# 29 [29] Notice of Appearance |
|
October 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Financial Disclosure Form Doc ID# 27 [27] Financial Disclosure Form |
|
October 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Service Doc ID# 28 [28] Certificate of Service |
|
October 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion Doc ID# 26 [26] Plaintiffs Motion for Permission to Relocate with a Minor Child |
|
March 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Administrative Reassignment - Judicial Officer Change Pursuant to Administrative Order 23-03 - Reassigned to Judge Regina M. McConnell Judge: ChangePursuant to Administrative Order 23-03 - Reassigned to Judge Regina M. McConnell |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.