Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 29, 2021 |
CategoryDivorce - Complaint |
Last RefreshedNovember 09, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Status Check: re: Settlement
Judge: Henderson, Bill |
|
October 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Order Doc ID# 34 [34] Notice of Entry of Order Granting Withdrawal of Attorney for Defendant |
|
October 12, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Doc ID# 33 [33] Order Granting Withdrawal of Attorney |
|
September 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Service Doc ID# 32 [32] Affidavit of Service |
|
September 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
All Pending Motions Motion to Withdraw as Attorneys of Record for Defendant, Miguel Hernandez...Return Hearing: re: FMC Mediation Judge: Henderson, Bill |
|
September 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Return Hearing Status Check: re: FMC Mediation. Judge: Henderson, Bill |
|
September 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion to Withdraw as Attorney's of Record for Defendant, Miguel Hernandez
Judge: Henderson, Bill |
|
September 17, 2021 | Docket Event |
Receipt of Copy Doc ID# 31 [31] Receipt of Copy |
|
September 10, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order Shortening Time Doc ID# 30 [30] Hernandez - Order Shortening Time (OST) |
|
September 09, 2021 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Application for Order Doc ID# 29 [29] Ex Parte Request for Order Shortening Time |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.