Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Michele Mercer presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 29, 2021 |
CategoryDivorce - Joint Petition |
Last RefreshedJanuary 24, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Status Check re: Submission of Order from the 1/23/2023 hearing by Attorney Lowrey Judge: Mercer, Shell |
|
January 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion Plaintiff's Motion for Order to Show Cause Why Defendant Should Not Be Held In Contempt for His Violations of the Order and Decree of Divorce, Filed May 25, 2021 Judge: Mercer, Shell |
|
January 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Rescheduling of Hearing Doc ID# 19 [19] Notice of Rescheduling of Hearing & Notice of Audio/Visual Appearance |
|
November 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion Plaintiff's Motion for Order to Show Cause Why Defendant Should Not Be Held In Contempt for His Violations of the Order and Decree of Divorce, Filed May 25, 2021 Judge: Mercer, Shell |
|
September 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Service Doc ID# 18 [18] Certificate of Service, Notice of Hearing and Motion re OSC |
|
September 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing Doc ID# 17 [17] Notice of Hearing |
|
September 23, 2022 | Docket Event |
Clerk's Notice of Nonconforming Document Doc ID# 16 [16] Clerks Notice of Nonconforming Document |
|
September 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing Doc ID# 15 [15] Request for Clerk's Notice of Hearing |
|
September 10, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Appearance Doc ID# 14 [14] Notice of Appearance (Donald Lowrey, Esq) |
|
September 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
Family Court Motion Opposition Fee Information Sheet Doc ID# 12 [12] Motion Fee Information Sheet |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.