Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
Baltazar-Escobar, Gabriela, filed a(n) Child Custody Complaint case represented by Brianna Renee Bower, against Ramirez, Joaquin Raymundo, represented by Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Harter, Mathew presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHarter, Mathew Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 29, 2020 |
CategoryChild Custody Complaint |
Last RefreshedJune 30, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
Non-Jury Trial (1/2 Day - In-Person) Judge: Gaudet, Paul M.) (1/2 Day - In-Person |
|
June 29, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Setting Civil Non-Jury Trial Doc ID# 54 [54] Order Setting Trial |
|
June 29, 2023 | Docket Event |
Status Check re status of dad's criminal case Judge: Gaudet, Paul M. |
|
March 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Administrative Reassignment - Judicial Officer Change Pursuant to Administrative Order 23-03 - Reassigned to Judge Paul M. Gaudet Judge: ChangePursuant to Administrative Order 23-03 - Reassigned to Judge Paul M. Gaudet |
|
February 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry Doc ID# 53 [53] Notice of Entry of Order |
|
February 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Doc ID# 52 [52] for January 26, 2023 Hearing |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
Status Check Resolution of Dad's Criminal Matter, Dad retain Interpreter Judge: s Voy, William, Vacant, Dept. N |
|
January 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Administrative Reassignment - Judicial Officer Change Pursuant to Administrative Order 22-14 - Reassigned to Vacant FC N Judge: ChangePursuant to Administrative Order 22-14 - Reassigned to Vacant FC N |
|
September 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Doc ID# 51 [51] Order Continuing November 01, 2022 Hearing |
|
September 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Motion Doc ID# 50 [50] Ex Parte Motion to Continue Status Check |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.