Case Last Refreshed: 11 months ago
Morris, Alexander Ray, filed a(n) Child Custody Complaint case represented by John D. Jones, against Erskine, Ashley Rachelle, represented by Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Mathew P. Harter presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMathew P. Harter Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateFebruary 07, 2020 |
CategoryChild Custody Complaint |
Last RefreshedMay 26, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 29, 2023 | Docket Event |
Status Check
Judge: Gaudet, Paul M. |
|
May 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
Opposition & Countermotion Plaintiff, Alexander Morris', Opposition to Motion for Child Support Modifiction and Countermotion for Attorney Fees and Costs Judge: Gaudet, Paul M. |
|
May 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion For Child Support Modification
Judge: Gaudet, Paul M. |
|
May 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
Opposition and Countermotion Doc ID# 78 [78] Plaintiff, Alexander Morris', Opposition to Motion for Child Support Modifiction and Countermotion for Attorney Fees and Costs |
|
May 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Order Doc ID# 77 [77] Notice of Entry of Order Granting Continuance of the May 16, 2023 Hearing |
|
May 12, 2023 | Docket Event |
Financial Disclosure Form Doc ID# 76 [76] Plaintiff's Financial Disclosure Form |
|
May 11, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Doc ID# 75 [75] Order to Continue May 16, 2023 Hearing |
|
May 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Motion Doc ID# 74 [74] Ex Parte Motion For Continuance of May 16, 2023 Hearing |
|
May 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Order Doc ID# 73 [73] Notice of Entry of Order from April 6, 2023 Hearing |
|
May 03, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Doc ID# 72 [72] Order for the April 6, 2023 Hearing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.