Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Cap, Lindsey M., filed a(n) Child Custody Complaint case represented by Patrick R. Driscoll, against Zarco-Castro, Jonathan, represented by Andrew J. Semprazik, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Mathew P. Harter presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMathew P. Harter Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJanuary 02, 2020 |
CategoryChild Custody Complaint |
Last RefreshedApril 21, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
Calendar Call
Judge: Harter, Mathew |
|
April 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
Parenting Agreement Doc ID# 53 [53] Partial Parenting Agreement |
|
April 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
Return Hearing FMC Mediation Judge: Gaudet, Paul M. |
|
April 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
All Pending Motions CONT FROM 3/21... FMC MEDIATION Judge: Gaudet, Paul M. |
|
April 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion cont from 3/21 Judge: Gaudet, Paul M. |
|
April 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Supplemental Exhibits Doc ID# 52 [52] Supplement to Defendant's Exhibits in Support of Defendant's Motion to Modify Child Custody |
|
April 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order Doc ID# 51 [51] to Continue April 13, 2023 Hearing |
|
April 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Ex Parte Doc ID# 50 [50] Ex Parte Application to Move Hearing |
|
April 04, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Rescheduling of Hearing Doc ID# 49 [49] from 9:00am to 2:30pm |
|
March 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Administrative Reassignment - Judicial Officer Change Pursuant to Administrative Order 23-03 - Reassigned to Judge Paul M. Gaudet Judge: ChangePursuant to Administrative Order 23-03 - Reassigned to Judge Paul M. Gaudet |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.