Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Perea, Fernando, filed a(n) Child Custody Complaint case represented by Pro Se, against Sandoval, Silvia, represented by Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 30, 2019 |
CategoryChild Custody Complaint |
Last RefreshedNovember 26, 2020 |
|
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
Confidential Information sheet - Custody Confidential Family Court Information Sheet |
|
April 09, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney of Record | |
April 08, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Decree | |
March 31, 2020 | Docket Event |
Custody Decree / Order Decree of Custody |
|
March 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
Case Management Conference
Judge: Ochoa, Vincent |
|
March 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
All Pending Motions
Judge: Ochoa, Vincent |
|
March 23, 2020 | Docket Event | Parenting Agreement | |
March 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
Return Hearing Family Mediation Center Judge: Ochoa, Vincent |
|
March 18, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Intent to Appear Telephonically at the March 23, 2020 Hearing | |
March 17, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Intent to Appear Telephonically at the March 23, 2020 Hearing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.