Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Cristiani, Alexess Ellen, Hitt, Andrew, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 30, 2019 |
CategoryDivorce - Joint Petition |
Last RefreshedJuly 25, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion to Modify Child Support and Spousal Support (Cont'd from 05/23/2023)
Judge: Cutter, Nadin) Motion to Modify Child Support and Spousal Support (Cont'd from 05/23/2023 |
|
July 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice Doc ID# 17 [17] Notice of Audio/Visual Appearance 07.24.23 |
|
June 02, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Order Doc ID# 16 [16] Notice of Entry |
|
June 01, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Doc ID# 15 [15] ORDER AFTER HEARING ON MAY 23, 2023 |
|
May 23, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion to Modify Child Support or Spousal Support
Judge: Cutter, Nadin |
|
May 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice Doc ID# 14 [14] Notice of Audio/Visual Appearance |
|
April 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Service Doc ID# 12 [12] Certificate of Service |
|
April 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion Doc ID# 11 [11] Motion to Modify Child Support, or Spousal Support |
|
April 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Filing Doc ID# 13 [13] 3rd Paycheck Stub from Andrew |
|
March 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion Vacated - No Service Judge: Cutter, Nadin |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.