Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Eala, Marcus Noel, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Pro Se, against Thompson, Maria Virginia, represented by Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with David S. Gibson, Jr. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 27, 2019 |
CategoryAnnulment Complaint |
Last RefreshedNovember 25, 2020 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
Administrative Reassignment to Department S Civil Domestic Case Reassignment from Judge David Gibson Jr. Department L |
|
February 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
Decree of Annulment decree and notice page that was previously submitted |
|
February 05, 2020 | Docket Event |
Status Check Vacated Judge: Gibson, David, Jr. |
|
January 31, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Order | |
January 28, 2020 | Docket Event | Decree of Annulment | |
January 21, 2020 | Docket Event | Default | |
January 14, 2020 | Docket Event | Clerk's Notice of Nonconforming Document | |
January 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
Affidavit in Support of Summary Disposition affidavit summary disposition |
|
January 14, 2020 | Docket Event | request for summary disposition of decree | |
January 14, 2020 | Docket Event |
Default ***NOT ISSUED - 21 Days |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.