Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Michele Mercer presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 27, 2019 |
CategoryDivorce - Complaint |
Last RefreshedMay 10, 2022 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 06, 2022 | Docket Event |
Decision The Court's Decision from the 4.26.22 Motion Hearing Judge: Mercer, Shell |
|
May 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Change of Address Doc ID# 30 [30] Notice of Change of Address |
|
April 27, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Order Doc ID# 29 [29] Notice of Entry of Order |
|
April 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Doc ID# 28 [28] Order from March 14, 2022 Hearing |
|
April 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
All Pending Motions
Judge: Mercer, Shell |
|
April 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
Status Check Submission of 3.14.22 Motion Hearing Order, Schedule of Arrears and Motion to Modify Spousal Support Judge: Mercer, Shell |
|
April 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
Schedule of Arrearages Doc ID# 27 [27] Amended Schedule of Arrearages |
|
April 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
Opposition & Countermotion Defendant's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion for an Order to Show Cause Against Plaintiff, To Set-Aside the Spousal Support Provision in the Decree of Divorce, In The Alternative, To Modify Spousal Support, To Strike Exhibits 2-8 of Plaintiff s Motion, For Sanctions, For Attorney's Fees and Costs and Related Relief Judge: Mercer, Shell |
|
April 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion for Order to Show Cause Plaintiff's Motion for Order to Show Cause Judge: Mercer, Shell |
|
April 25, 2022 | Docket Event |
Brief Doc ID# 25 [25] Defendant's Status Check Brief |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.