Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Wimberly, Paulette, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Pro Se, against Wimberly, Rodrigo Ortega, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 26, 2019 |
CategoryDivorce - Complaint |
Last RefreshedNovember 24, 2020 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 12, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Dismissal without Prejudice Notice OF Entry Of Order Of Dismissal Without Prejudice |
|
March 10, 2020 | Docket Event | Order Of Dismissal Without Prejudice | |
March 06, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal Judge: Pomrenze, Sandra |
|
February 14, 2020 | Docket Event | Order to Show Cause Re: Dismissal | |
December 12, 2019 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Attempted Service | |
October 31, 2019 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Due Diligence | |
October 22, 2019 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Due Diligence | |
October 22, 2019 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Motion For Publication | |
October 16, 2019 | Docket Event | Declaration of Due Diligence by Private Process Server | |
October 04, 2019 | Docket Event |
Order to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Plaintiff's Order to Proceed in Forma Pauperis |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.