Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Tijerina, Erica Celest, Tijerina, Andrew Charles, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Mathew P. Harter presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMathew P. Harter Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 01, 2019 |
CategoryDivorce - Joint Petition |
Last RefreshedApril 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion
Judge: Vacant, Dept. C |
|
April 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion Andrews Motion for an Order to Enforce and/or for an Order to Show Cause regarding Contempt Judge: Harter, Mathew |
|
March 20, 2023 | Docket Event |
Administrative Reassignment to Department C Pursuant to Administrative Order 23-03 - Reassigned to Vacant, Dept. C |
|
March 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Doc ID# 44 [44] D592097 Order After 3-14-23 Hearing |
|
March 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Exhibits Doc ID# 43 [43] Tax Return 2022 |
|
March 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Filing Doc ID# 43 [43] Tax Return 2022 |
|
March 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Mailing Doc ID# 42 [42] Certificate of Mailing |
|
March 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion Doc ID# 41 [41] Andrews Motion for an Order to Enforce and/or for an Order to Show Cause regarding Contempt |
|
March 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion
Judge: Voy, William |
|
January 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Telephonic Hearing Doc ID# 40 [40] Video Appearance Request |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.