Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Clarke, William, filed a(n) Child Custody Complaint case represented by Pro Se, against Pederson, Anastasia, represented by Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 28, 2019 |
CategoryChild Custody Complaint |
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2020 |
|
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 25, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney | |
November 25, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Decree | |
October 30, 2019 | Docket Event |
Custody Decree / Order Stipulated Decree of Custody |
|
October 23, 2019 | Docket Event | Waiver of Counsel | |
October 23, 2019 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Resident Witness | |
October 23, 2019 | Docket Event | Request for Summary Disposition | |
October 04, 2019 | Docket Event |
Status Check Submission of Stipulated Decree Judge: Forsberg, Rhonda K. |
|
October 01, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Correction to Case Caption | |
September 05, 2019 | Docket Event |
Uncontested Hearing Vacated - per Clerk Judge: Forsberg, Rhonda K. |
|
September 04, 2019 | Docket Event |
Minute Order
Judge: Forsberg, Rhonda K. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.