Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Demille, Casey, filed a(n) Child Custody Complaint case represented by Pro Se, against Riggs, Jynna, represented by Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 26, 2019 |
CategoryChild Custody Complaint |
Last RefreshedNovember 25, 2020 |
|
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
Withdrawal of Attorney Notice of Withdrawal as Counsel of Record |
|
May 27, 2020 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Dismissal without Prejudice Notice of Entry of Order of Dismissal Without Prejudice |
|
May 21, 2020 | Docket Event | Order of Dismissal Without Prejudice | |
July 31, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of July 29, 2019 Minute Order | |
July 30, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion Vacated - per Judge Judge: Moss, Cheryl B. |
|
July 29, 2019 | Docket Event |
Minute Order
Judge: Moss, Cheryl B. |
|
June 28, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
June 28, 2019 | Docket Event | Motion For Joint Legal And Primary Physical Custody Of The Minor Child, To Confirm Paternity, For Specific Visitation For Defendant, For Mandatory Mediation, For Child Support, For Medical Coverage, For One-Half Of Any School And Extra-Curricular Activities Costs/Expenses, For The Tax Exemption, For Attorneys Fees And Costs, And For Other Related Relief | |
June 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
Summons Electronically Issued - Service Pending Summons |
|
June 26, 2019 | Docket Event | Summons |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.