Case Last Refreshed: 10 months ago
Quezada, Yarini, filed a(n) Child Custody Complaint case represented by John T. Kelleher, against Webb, Jonathan, represented by Bruce I. Shapiro, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Mathew P. Harter presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMathew P. Harter Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 03, 2019 |
CategoryChild Custody Complaint |
Last RefreshedJune 17, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 16, 2023 | Docket Event |
Evidentiary Hearing Full day (Plaintiff's motion to relocate with minor child; Defendant's countermotion for primary physical custody) Judge: Gaudet, Paul M.) Full day (Plaintiff's motion to relocate with minor child; Defendant's countermotion for primary physical custody |
|
June 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
Pre-trial Memorandum Doc ID# 55 [55] Pre-Trial Memorandum |
|
June 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice Doc ID# 54 [54] Notice of Intent to Appear by Simultaneous Audiovisual Transmission Equipment |
|
June 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
Pre-trial Memorandum Doc ID# 53 [53] Defendant's Pre-trial Memorandum |
|
June 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Witness List Doc ID# 51 [51] Defendant's Witness List |
|
June 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Certificate of Service Doc ID# 52 [52] Certificate of Service |
|
May 19, 2023 | Docket Event |
Financial Disclosure Form Doc ID# 50 [50] Financial Disclosure Form |
|
May 08, 2023 | Docket Event |
Financial Disclosure Form Doc ID# 49 [49] Financial Disclosure Form |
|
April 25, 2023 | Docket Event |
Acceptance of Service Doc ID# 48 [48] Acceptance of Service |
|
April 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Opposition & Countermotion Vacated Judge: Gaudet, Paul M. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.