Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Clover, Kristina, filed a(n) Child Custody Complaint case represented by Kerstan D. Hubbs, Esq, against Dysart, Cole, represented by Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Harter, Mathew presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHarter, Mathew Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateAugust 29, 2018 |
CategoryChild Custody Complaint |
Last RefreshedJanuary 12, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
Supplement Plaintiff's Supplement Exhibit to Motion for Fees and Costs |
|
August 13, 2019 | Docket Event | Decision and Order re: Attorney Fees | |
August 13, 2019 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Order Notice of Entry of Decision and Order |
|
August 05, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion Plaintiff's Motion for Fees and Costs Judge: Harter, Mathew |
|
July 18, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Order | |
July 11, 2019 | Docket Event | Order | |
July 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
Memorandum Plaintiff's Amended Memorandum of Fees and Costs |
|
July 03, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
July 03, 2019 | Docket Event |
Motion Plaintiff's Motion for Fees and Costs |
|
June 12, 2019 | Docket Event |
Evidentiary Hearing EH full day Judge: Harter, Mathew |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.