Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Malyarov, Tatiana, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Joseph W. Houston, Ii, against Malyarov, Sergiy, represented by Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2017 |
CategoryDivorce - Complaint |
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2020 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 23, 2020 | Docket Event |
Evidentiary Hearing Vacated - per Stipulation and Order Judge: Hughes, Rena G. |
|
July 14, 2020 | Docket Event | Certificate of Service | |
July 13, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Withdrawal as Attorney of Record | |
July 01, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Order | |
June 30, 2020 | Docket Event | Stipulation and Order | |
March 10, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Order | |
March 06, 2020 | Docket Event | Order from 08.09.2019 | |
March 03, 2020 | Docket Event |
Motion Vacated Judge: Hughes, Rena G. |
|
February 18, 2020 | Docket Event |
Return Hearing Report from Michelle Graveley Judge: Steel, Dianne |
|
January 30, 2020 | Docket Event | Notice of Withdrawal of Motion to Withdraw and Adjudicate Attorney's Lien |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.