Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Enokenwa, Cubson, filed a(n) Child Custody Complaint case represented by Pro Se, against Henderson, Diane, represented by Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Rhonda K. Forsberg presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2017 |
CategoryChild Custody Complaint |
Last RefreshedDecember 09, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion Vacated - per Judge Judge: Cherry, Michael A. |
|
December 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
Clerk's Notice of Hearing Doc ID# 41 [41] Clerk's Notice of Hearing |
|
December 07, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion Doc ID# 40 [40] Evidence and True Finding |
|
November 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
Return Hearing
Judge: Hardcastle, Kathy |
|
November 08, 2022 | Docket Event | Return Hearing re: Drug Testing, FMC Parenting Agreement, and Donna's House Report. | |
September 30, 2022 | Docket Event |
Return Hearing re: FMC Mediation and Donna's House Report Judge: Pomrenze, Sandra |
|
August 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
Clerk's Notice of Nonconforming Document Doc ID# 39 [39] Clerks Notice of Nonconforming Document |
|
August 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Doc ID# 38 [38] Order for Return Hearing |
|
August 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order for Family Mediation Center Services Doc ID# 34 [34] ORDER FOR FAMILY MEDIATION CENTER SERVICES |
|
August 04, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Doc ID# 33 [33] Order for Supervised Visitation at Donna's House for Deft |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.