Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Beauchmin, Kevin, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Pro Se, against Beauchmin, Latisha Nanette, represented by Warren G Freeman, Esq, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Duckworth, Bryce C. presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 26, 2017 |
CategoryDivorce - Complaint |
Last RefreshedJanuary 12, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 10, 2019 | Docket Event |
Evidentiary Hearing Vacated - per Stipulation and Order Judge: Duckworth, Bryce C. |
|
September 06, 2019 | Docket Event | Stipulation and Order | |
July 10, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Order From Hearing | |
July 10, 2019 | Docket Event | Order From Hearing | |
July 01, 2019 | Docket Event |
Opposition & Countermotion Deft's Opposition to Motion for Orders to Modify Child Custody, Visitation, and/or Child Support and Countermotion Judge: Duckworth, Bryce C. |
|
July 01, 2019 | Docket Event |
Return Hearing FMC Child Interview of the MC, Miranda Judge: Duckworth, Bryce C. |
|
July 01, 2019 | Docket Event |
All Pending Motions
Judge: Duckworth, Bryce C. |
|
May 20, 2019 | Docket Event |
Exhibits Pltf Exhibit Appendix |
|
May 20, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice of Rescheduling of Hearing | |
May 17, 2019 | Docket Event |
Financial Disclosure Form General Financial Disclosure Form |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.