Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Robinson, Lakeshia, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Edward Kainen, against Robinson, Dejuan, represented by Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Henderson, Bill presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 30, 2016 |
CategoryDivorce - Complaint |
Last RefreshedJanuary 12, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 06, 2018 | Docket Event |
Withdrawal of Attorney Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney |
|
December 14, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Order Resolving Outstanding Issues | |
December 13, 2017 | Docket Event | Order Resolving Outstanding Issues | |
November 15, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney | |
November 15, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Order | |
November 14, 2017 | Docket Event | Order | |
November 09, 2017 | Docket Event |
Evidentiary Hearing Vacated - Moot Judge: Henderson, Bill) Vacated - MootRe: Custody (CONT from 10/2/17 |
|
November 08, 2017 | Docket Event | Stipulation Resolving Outstanding Issues | |
November 07, 2017 | Docket Event |
Objection Discovery Objection Hearing Judge: Henderson, Bill |
|
November 03, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Stipulation and Order to Modify Pretrial Deadlines |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.