Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
Covarrubias, Andres, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Pro Se, against Godoy Hernandez, Maria Del Carmen, represented by Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Bill G. Henderson presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 29, 2016 |
CategoryDivorce - Complaint |
Last RefreshedMarch 28, 2023 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
Settlement Conference Vacated Judge: Vacant, Dept. C |
|
March 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Parenting Agreement Doc ID# 69 [69] Partial Parenting Agreement |
|
March 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Return Hearing Re: FMC Mediation
Judge: Henderson, Bill |
|
March 22, 2023 | Docket Event |
Withdrawal of Attorney Doc ID# 68 [68] Withdrawal of Attorney |
|
February 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Return Hearing Re: FMC Mediation
Judge: Henderson, Bill |
|
November 18, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Withdrawal Doc ID# 67 [67] Notice of Withdrawal as Attorney of Record for Defendant |
|
November 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Order Doc ID# 66 [66] Notice of Entry of Order After November 14, 2022 Hearing |
|
November 17, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Doc ID# 65 [65] Order After 11-14-22 Hearing |
|
November 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
All Pending Motions Defendant's Notice of Motion to Modify Child Custody, Visitation, and/or Child Support... Plaintiff's Opposition to Motion to Modify Custody and Countermotion for an Order to Enforce or in the Alternative to Modify to Joint Physical Custody Judge: Henderson, Bill |
|
November 14, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order for Family Mediation Center Services Doc ID# 64
Judge: : Henderson, Bill |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.