Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Garcia, Eleonora, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Pro Se, against Garcia, John F, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 29, 2016 |
CategoryDivorce - Complaint |
Last RefreshedNovember 27, 2020 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 07, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Decree of Divorce and Withdrawal of Attorney | |
April 05, 2017 | Docket Event | Decree of Divorce | |
March 31, 2017 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Resident Witness Affidavit of Residency |
|
March 17, 2017 | Docket Event | Request for Summary Disposition of Complaint for Divorce with Plaintiff's Affidavit | |
February 27, 2017 | Docket Event |
Uncontested Hearing Vacated Judge: Harter, Mathew |
|
February 24, 2017 | Docket Event |
Minute Order
Judge: Harter, Mathew |
|
January 30, 2017 | Docket Event | Notice of Hearing | |
January 17, 2017 | Docket Event | Default | |
January 05, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice of Intent to Take Default Notice of Intention to Enter Default |
|
December 09, 2016 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Service |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.