Case Last Refreshed: 9 months ago
Turenne, Thomas R., filed a(n) Child Custody Complaint case represented by Pro Se, against Lopez, Christina, represented by Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Nadin Cutter presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 29, 2016 |
CategoryChild Custody Complaint |
Last RefreshedAugust 01, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 04, 2021 | Docket Event |
Administrative Reassignment - Judicial Officer Change Judicial Reassignment to Judge Nadin Cutter Judge: ChangeJudicial Reassignment to Judge Nadin Cutter |
|
May 01, 2017 | Docket Event |
Evidentiary Hearing EH (half day) Judge: Brown, Lisa) EH (half day |
|
March 07, 2017 | Docket Event |
Return Hearing FMC Mediation; Status check regarding DV charges against Pltf (Def may appear by phone @ 917-951-6455) Judge: Bonaventure, Joseph T.) FMC Mediation; Status check regarding DV charges against Pltf (Def may appear by phone @ 917-951-6455 |
|
February 17, 2017 | Docket Event |
Order Doc ID# 22 [22] Order After Hearing |
|
February 17, 2017 | Docket Event | Order After Hearing | |
January 30, 2017 | Docket Event |
Withdrawal of Attorney Doc ID# 21 [21] Withdrawal of Attorney |
|
January 30, 2017 | Docket Event | Withdrawal of Attorney | |
January 24, 2017 | Docket Event |
Answer and Counterclaim - Child Custody Doc ID# 17 [17] Answer and Counterclaim - Child Custody |
|
January 24, 2017 | Docket Event |
Notice Doc ID# 18 [18] Notice of Intent to Appear by Communication Equipment (NOT A GOOD NUMBER for Defendant - someone claiming to be Def's cousin answered and said Def not at this number) |
|
January 24, 2017 | Docket Event |
Opposition and Countermotion Doc ID# 20 [20] Defendant's Opposition to Motion for Orders for Temporary Custody, Visitation, and/or Child Support, and Countermotion |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.