Case Last Refreshed: 1 year ago
filed a(n) case in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts .
Case Number |
Filing DateSeptember 29, 2016 |
Last RefreshedFebruary 28, 2023 |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Return Hearing Vacated - Moot Judge: Ritchie, T. Arthur, Jr. |
|
February 27, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Order Doc ID# 37 [37] Notice of Entry of Stipulation and Order Resolving Custody Issues |
|
February 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
Custody Decree / Order Doc ID# 36 [36] 20230210 Stipulation and Order to Resolve Custody Issues (R2) |
|
February 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Order Doc ID# 35 [35] Notice of Entry of Order After Hearing |
|
February 24, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Doc ID# 34 [34] 20230223 Order After Hearing |
|
February 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Order for Family Mediation Center Services Doc ID# 33 | |
February 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
Financial Disclosure Form Doc ID# 32 [32] Financial Disclosure Form |
|
February 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion
Judge: Ritchie, T. Arthur, Jr. |
|
February 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Affidavit of Resident Witness Doc ID# 31 [31] Affidavit of Resident Witness |
|
December 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
Opposition and Countermotion Doc ID# 29 [29] Opposition To Defendants Motion For Temporary Custody And Countermotion For Temporary Orders And Attorneys Fees |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.