Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Marchena-Mantilla, Mildred J., filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Pro Se, against Bermudez, Norwins Ariel, represented by Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with William B. Gonzalez presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeWilliam B. Gonzalez Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateSeptember 14, 2015 |
CategoryDivorce - Complaint |
Last RefreshedNovember 25, 2020 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 13, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Withdrawal | |
February 13, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Order | |
February 13, 2018 | Docket Event | Order 12.27.17 | |
January 09, 2018 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry | |
December 28, 2017 | Docket Event |
Evidentiary Hearing Vacated - per Judge Judge: Pomrenze, Sandra |
|
December 27, 2017 | Docket Event |
Evidentiary Hearing Re: Relocation Day one Judge: Pomrenze, Sandra |
|
October 16, 2017 | Docket Event | Order from Hearing on August 30, 2017 | |
August 30, 2017 | Docket Event |
All Pending Motions
Judge: Pomrenze, Sandra |
|
August 30, 2017 | Docket Event |
Motion Pltf's Motion for Permission to Relocate with a Minor Child Judge: Pomrenze, Sandra |
|
August 30, 2017 | Docket Event |
Opposition Deft's Opposition To Motion For Permission To Relocate WIth A Minor Child And Countermotion Judge: Pomrenze, Sandra |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.