Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Goodrich, Cynthia, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Pro Se, against Goodrich, Nathan, represented by Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Gonzalez, William B presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 14, 2013 |
CategoryDivorce - Complaint |
Last RefreshedJanuary 12, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 10, 2015 | Docket Event |
Satisfaction of Judgment Satisfaction and Release of Lien |
|
January 05, 2015 | Docket Event |
Judicial Elections 2014 - Case Reassignment Family Court Judicial Officer Reassignment 2014 Judge: Reassignment 2014 |
|
December 08, 2014 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Qualified Domestic Relations Order | |
December 02, 2014 | Docket Event | Qualified Domestic Relation Order | |
October 09, 2014 | Docket Event | Withdrawal of Attorney | |
August 18, 2014 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Stipulation and Order | |
August 13, 2014 | Docket Event | Stipulation and Order Modifying Decree of Divorce | |
July 18, 2014 | Docket Event |
Evidentiary Hearing Vacated - per Stipulation Judge: Gonzalez, William B |
|
July 01, 2014 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Decree of Divorce | |
June 30, 2014 | Docket Event |
Calendar Call Vacated - per Stipulation Judge: Gonzalez, William B |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.