Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Dunn, Christopher, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Pro Se, against Dunn, Denise, represented by Nancy Harkess, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Robert W. Teuton presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 06, 2013 |
CategoryDivorce - Complaint |
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2020 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 09, 2016 | Docket Event | Parenting Agreement | |
June 09, 2016 | Docket Event |
Return Hearing FMC Judge: Burton, Rebecca L. |
|
May 17, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Withdrawal Rule 46 Withdrawal as Counsel of Record |
|
April 26, 2016 | Docket Event | Certificate of Service | |
April 26, 2016 | Docket Event |
Financial Disclosure Form General Financial Disclosure Form |
|
April 26, 2016 | Docket Event |
Opposition and Countermotion Deft's Opposition to Motion for Orders to Modify Child Custody, Visitation, and/or Child Support and Countermotion |
|
March 25, 2016 | Docket Event | Order from March 10, 2016 Hearing | |
March 10, 2016 | Docket Event | Order for Family Mediation Center Services | |
March 10, 2016 | Docket Event |
Motion Pltf's Motion to Modify Child Custody to a Shared Parenting Arrangement in Based on the De Facto Circumstances and Best Interests; To Modify Child Support Accordingly; To Resolve Issue of the Martial Residence; For Costs and Fees; And Related Matters Judge: Burton, Rebecca L. |
|
January 26, 2016 | Docket Event | Certificate of Mailing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.