Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Young, Daniella Rose, filed a(n) Child Custody Complaint case represented by Brian J Steinberg, against Rice, Dante Antonio, represented by Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Nathan, Gayle presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 17, 2012 |
CategoryChild Custody Complaint |
Last RefreshedJanuary 12, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 05, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Order | |
March 31, 2016 | Docket Event | Order | |
March 24, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Order | |
March 24, 2016 | Docket Event | Order | |
March 21, 2016 | Docket Event |
Status Check re: finalize the holiday schedule and other unresolved issues Judge: Gentile, Denise L |
|
January 26, 2016 | Docket Event |
Return Hearing FMC MEDIATION/REUNIFICATION/ATI DRUG TEST RESULTS (DEFT) Judge: Gentile, Denise L) FMC MEDIATION/REUNIFICATION/ATI DRUG TEST RESULTS (DEFT |
|
January 25, 2016 | Docket Event | Financial Disclosure Form | |
January 25, 2016 | Docket Event |
Supplemental Plaintiff's Supplemental Attachment to Opposition to Defendant's Motion to Resolve Issues Custody/Visitation Resetting the Specs to Same; for Reunification; for Behavior Order; for Defendant's Costs and/or Attorney's Fees; and Related Relief Matters and Countermotion for Attorney's Fees and other Related Relief |
|
January 25, 2016 | Docket Event |
Miscellaneous Filing Exhibits |
|
December 14, 2015 | Docket Event | Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.