Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Caro, Peggy L, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Pro Se, against Caro, Antonio, represented by Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Kent, Lisa M presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKent, Lisa M Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateOctober 03, 2007 |
CategoryDivorce - Complaint |
Last RefreshedJanuary 12, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 05, 2015 | Docket Event |
Judicial Elections 2014 - Case Reassignment Family Court Judicial Officer Reassignment 2014 Judge: Reassignment 2014 |
|
October 01, 2010 | Docket Event | Stipulation and Order | |
July 28, 2010 | Docket Event | Reply To Plaintiff's Opposition Answer To Defendants Motion To Show Cause | |
July 12, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice of Attorney Lien Notice Of Claim Of Attorney's Lien |
|
July 06, 2010 | Docket Event |
Motion for Order to Show Cause
Judge: Pollock, Kenneth E. |
|
July 02, 2010 | Docket Event |
Answer to Opposition to Motion to Show Cause |
|
June 04, 2010 | Docket Event | Certificate of Mailing | |
June 01, 2010 | Docket Event | Motion | |
June 01, 2010 | Docket Event |
Notice of Motion For an Order to Show Cause |
|
June 01, 2010 | Docket Event | Family Court Motion Opposition Fee Information Sheet |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.