Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Alcaraz, Cheryl, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Patricia A. Marr, Esq, against Alcaraz, Raul A, represented by Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 31, 2007 |
CategoryDivorce - Complaint |
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2020 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 30, 2016 | Docket Event |
Withdrawal of Attorney Notice of Withdrawal of Attorney |
|
August 19, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of order | |
June 22, 2016 | Docket Event | Qualified Domestic Relation Order | |
March 31, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Order After Hearing | |
March 31, 2016 | Docket Event | Order After Hearing of January 27, 2016 | |
February 22, 2016 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Decree Notice of Entry of Amended Decree of Divorce |
|
February 19, 2016 | Docket Event | Amended Decree of Divorce Nunc Pro Tunc Re: Defendant's Fidelity IRA #561352417 | |
February 19, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Order | |
February 09, 2016 | Docket Event | Qualified Domestic Relation Order | |
January 27, 2016 | Docket Event |
Further Proceedings Re: Any Additional Claims Of Plaintiff and Preparation of QDRO Judge: Ritchie, T. Arthur, Jr. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.