Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Trompke, Deborah, filed a(n) Child Custody Complaint case represented by Charmaine L. Clark, against Stevens, Jayson T-Mark, represented by Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 31, 2007 |
CategoryChild Custody Complaint |
Last RefreshedNovember 24, 2020 |
|
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 13, 2014 | Docket Event | Domestic Notice to Statistically Close Case | |
May 05, 2014 | Docket Event | Stipulation and Order | |
April 14, 2014 | Docket Event |
Motion Vacated - per Attorney or Pro Per Judge: Ritchie, T. Arthur, Jr. |
|
March 20, 2014 | Docket Event |
Motion to Vacate Notice to Vacate Hearing Set on April 14th |
|
March 17, 2014 | Docket Event | Notice of Motion | |
March 17, 2014 | Docket Event | Notice of Change of Address | |
March 17, 2014 | Docket Event |
Financial Disclosure Form General Financial Disclosure Form |
|
March 17, 2014 | Docket Event | Ex Parte Motion for an Order Shortening Time | |
March 17, 2014 | Docket Event | Motion to Modify Custody, Visitation, and/or Child Support | |
January 01, 2011 | Docket Event |
Administrative Reassignment to Department H Case reassigned from Department J |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.