Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Shope, Joshua, filed a(n) Child Custody Complaint case represented by Pro Se, against Kieser, Shaunna, represented by Jillian M. Tindall, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 26, 2007 |
CategoryChild Custody Complaint |
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2020 |
|
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 06, 2015 | Docket Event | Certificate of Disposal of Exhibits | |
January 06, 2015 | Docket Event | Petition and Order to Destroy / Dispose of Exhibits | |
July 18, 2013 | Docket Event | Domestic Notice to Statistically Close Case | |
May 02, 2012 | Docket Event |
Withdrawal of Attorney Withdraw of Attorney |
|
January 23, 2012 | Docket Event |
Motion for Withdrawal Alan Buttell's Motion To Withdraw As Attorney Of Record Judge: Henderson, Bill |
|
December 08, 2011 | Docket Event |
Evidentiary Hearing
Judge: Henderson, Bill |
|
December 07, 2011 | Docket Event |
Pre-trial Memorandum Notice Of Appearance Of Counsel, And Defendant's Pre-Trial Memorandum |
|
November 30, 2011 | Docket Event | Request For Submission Of Motion Without Oral Argument EDCR 5.11 (Domestic | |
November 21, 2011 | Docket Event | Certificate of Mailing | |
November 16, 2011 | Docket Event | Motion To Withdraw As Attorney Of Record For Plaintiff |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.