Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Gold, Sarae, Gold, Herbert A, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 26, 2007 |
CategoryDivorce - Joint Petition |
Last RefreshedNovember 21, 2020 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 05, 2015 | Docket Event |
Judicial Elections 2014 - Case Reassignment Family Court Judicial Officer Reassignment 2014 Judge: Reassignment 2014 |
|
April 06, 2012 | Docket Event | Certificate of Disposal of Exhibits | |
April 06, 2012 | Docket Event | Petition and Order to Destroy / Dispose of Exhibits | |
January 01, 2011 | Docket Event |
Administrative Reassignment to Department T Case reassigned from Department K |
|
October 05, 2009 | Docket Event |
Notice of Withdrawal As Counsel Of Record |
|
September 29, 2009 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Decree Of Divorce |
|
September 29, 2009 | Docket Event |
Notice of Withdrawal As Counsel Of Record |
|
September 23, 2009 | Docket Event | Decree of Divorce | |
August 07, 2009 | Docket Event |
Non-Jury Trial
Judge: Giuliani, Cynthia N. |
|
August 04, 2009 | Docket Event |
Pre-trial Memorandum Plaintiff's Pre-Trial/Settlement Conference Memorandum |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.