Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Cano, Hugo, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Pro Se, against Cano, Jaisell, represented by Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Rhonda K. Forsberg presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeRhonda K. Forsberg Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 08, 2007 |
CategoryDivorce - Complaint |
Last RefreshedNovember 22, 2020 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 06, 2019 | Docket Event |
Administrative Reassignment to Department G From Judge Harter, Mathew To Judge Forsberg, Rhonda K. |
|
January 27, 2015 | Docket Event | Order for Family Mediation Center Services | |
January 01, 2009 | Docket Event |
Administrative Reassignment Reassigned from Department C to Department N |
|
October 31, 2007 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Order | |
October 31, 2007 | Docket Event | Withdrawal of Attorney | |
October 19, 2007 | Docket Event | Decree of Divorce | |
September 21, 2007 | Docket Event |
Non-Jury Trial
Judge: Del Vecchio, N Anthony |
|
September 17, 2007 | Docket Event |
Pre-trial Memorandum Defendant's |
|
September 14, 2007 | Docket Event | Pre-trial Memorandum | |
August 20, 2007 | Docket Event |
Non-Jury Trial Vacated - per Secretary Judge: Del Vecchio, N Anthony |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.