Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Warnholz, Jon A, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Tracy M. Rau, Esq, against Warnsholz, Celeste, represented by Pro Se, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Kent, Lisa M presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeKent, Lisa M Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJune 04, 2007 |
CategoryDivorce - Complaint |
Last RefreshedJanuary 12, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 06, 2019 | Docket Event |
Administrative Reassignment - Judicial Officer Change From Judge Cynthia Dianne Steel to Judge Rhonda K. Forsberg Judge: ChangeFrom Judge Cynthia Dianne Steel to Judge Rhonda K. Forsberg |
|
January 17, 2017 | Docket Event |
Administrative Reassignment to Department G Case reassigned from Judge Vincent Ochoa Dept S |
|
January 01, 2011 | Docket Event |
Administrative Reassignment to Department S Case reassigned from Department J |
|
February 04, 2009 | Docket Event |
Non-Jury Trial Vacated - per Stipulation and Order Judge: Pollock, Kenneth E. |
|
February 03, 2009 | Docket Event | Stipulation and Order for Dismissal | |
January 02, 2009 | Docket Event |
Notice of Rescheduling of Hearing |
|
September 23, 2008 | Docket Event |
Non-Jury Trial Vacated - per Stipulation and Order Judge: Kent, Lisa M |
|
September 10, 2008 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Order To Continue Trial |
|
September 08, 2008 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order To Continue Trial |
|
April 30, 2008 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.