Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Mckain, James William filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case represented by Pro Se, against Nevada State Of, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Michelle Leavitt presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 26, 2019 |
CategoryCriminal Appeal |
Last RefreshedAugust 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Case Reassigned to Department 12 From Judge Crystal Eller to Judge Michelle Leavitt |
|
February 22, 2021 | Docket Event |
Order to Statistically Close Case Doc ID# 10 [10] Civil Order to Statistically Close Case |
|
February 05, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Department Reassignment Doc ID# 9 [9] Notice of Department Reassignment |
|
February 21, 2020 | Docket Event |
Order Denying Doc ID# 8 [8] Order Denying Appellant's Appeal from Judgment of Conviction Justice Court, Moapa Township Remand to Lower Court |
|
February 21, 2020 | Docket Event | Order Denying Appellant's Appeal from Judgment of Conviction Justice Court, Moapa Township Remand to Lower Court | |
January 30, 2020 | Docket Event |
Argument Victoria Villegas, Esq. present on behalf of the State. Ms. Villegas reiterated points stated in the brief. COURT ORDERED, Appeal DENIED. Court directed the State to prepare the Order. Judge: Scotti, Richard F. |
|
January 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
Brief Doc ID# 7 [7] Respondent's Opening Brief to Appellant's Appeal From Judgment of Conviction Justice Court, Moapa Township |
|
January 09, 2020 | Docket Event |
Brief Respondent's Opening Brief to Appellant's Appeal From Judgment of Conviction Justice Court, Moapa Township |
|
October 24, 2019 | Docket Event |
Status Check Vacated Judge: Scotti, Richard F. |
|
October 24, 2019 | Docket Event |
Appeal From Lower Court Vacated Judge: Scotti, Richard F. |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.