Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Cherubini, Anna filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case represented by Public Defender, against State Of Nevada, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Bare, Rob presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeBare, Rob Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 31, 2015 |
CategoryCriminal Appeal |
Last RefreshedNovember 23, 2020 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Case Outcome TypeClerk'S Certificate |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Case Reassigned to Department 2 Reassigned From Judge Bare - Dept 32 |
|
September 09, 2016 | Docket Event | Remittitur to the Lower Court | |
August 05, 2016 | Docket Event | Order | |
August 05, 2016 | Docket Event |
NV Supreme Court Clerks Certificate/Judgment - Dismissed Nevada Supreme Court Clerk's Certificate Judgment - Dismissed |
|
June 08, 2016 | Docket Event | Case Appeal Statement | |
June 06, 2016 | Docket Event | Notice of Appeal | |
June 06, 2016 | Docket Event | Application to Proceed in Forma Pauperis | |
May 11, 2016 | Docket Event |
Argument / Decision Court provided a procedural overview of the case on record. Argument by Mr. Wood regarding if the record demonstrated a clear indication of whether the scratch wound or fall occurred first. Mr. Zadrowski argued regarding the chronological order of the string of events and the consistency of the victim's testimony. Further argument by Mr. Wood regarding whether the State met the burden. COURT stated FINDINGS in that there was testimony of a physical altercation that happen prior to the fall; therefore, ORDERED, CONVICTION AFFIRMED; DIRECTED, Mr. Zadrowski to prepare the Order. CASE TO BE REMANDED. Judge: Bare, Rob |
|
March 23, 2016 | Docket Event |
Appeal From Lower Court As the Transcript, Appellant's Opening Brief, and Respondent's Answering Brief have been filed, matter SET for Argument / Decision and the parties were advised of the following briefing schedule: Appellant s Reply due by 4/6/2016. 5/11/16 - 10:00 AM - ARGUMENT / DECISION Judge: Bare, Rob |
|
March 11, 2016 | Docket Event |
Brief Respondent's Answering Brief |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.