Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Bradford Robert Jerbic filed a(n) General Criminal - Criminal case represented by Craig A Mueller, against Las Vegas City Of, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2013 |
CategoryCriminal Appeal |
Last RefreshedNovember 25, 2020 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeGeneral Criminal |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 02, 2018 | Docket Event |
Case Reassigned to Department 2 Reassigned From Judge Bare - Dept 32 |
|
December 03, 2014 | Docket Event | Notice of Entry of Decision and Order | |
November 26, 2014 | Docket Event | Remittitur to the Lower Court | |
November 05, 2014 | Docket Event |
Minute Order This matter came before the court on October 8, 2014. Counsel presented their case and Court took matter under advisement. After carefully considering the papers submitted and hearing oral arguments, Court issued its Decision and Order this 5th day of November, 2014. COURT ORDERED, Defendants' appeal DENIED; conviction AFFIRMED. The case is remanded for completion of sentence. See Court's Decision and Order filed for full context. Judge: Bare, Rob |
|
November 05, 2014 | Docket Event | Decision and Order | |
September 25, 2014 | Docket Event | Supplemental | |
September 24, 2014 | Docket Event |
Decision Mr. Mueller moved to waive Appellant's presence. COURT SO ORDERED. Arguments by counsel in regard to whether the machine that administered the breath test was reliable at the time it was used, and whether Judge Roger erred in making the decision that the machine was reliable. Colloquy regarding the evidence presented in the trial below. COURT ORDERED, matter CONTINUED, for the City to provide evidence submitted at the trial below. 10/8/14 10:00 AM - ARGUMENT... CONTINUED Judge: Bare, Rob |
|
September 03, 2014 | Docket Event | Receipt of Copy - Respondent's Answering Brief | |
August 25, 2014 | Docket Event |
Brief Respondent's Answering Brief |
|
August 01, 2014 | Docket Event |
Brief Appellant's Opening Brief |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.