Case Last Refreshed: 4 weeks ago
Margolis, Kenneth filed a(n) General Appeals - Appeals case represented by Pro Se, against Metcalfe, Michael, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Erika D. Ballou presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 30, 2024 |
CategoryAppeal From Lower Court |
Last RefreshedApril 11, 2024 |
Practice AreaAppeals |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeGeneral Appeals |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 16, 2024 | Docket Event |
Appeal From Lower Court Vacated Judge: Ballou, Erika |
|
April 10, 2024 | Docket Event |
Minute Order The Court having considered all papers and pleadings and having determined that no hearing is necessary, hereby VACATES the hearing on Appellant Kenneth Margolis's January 30, 2024, Appeal from Justice Court set for April 16, 2024. The Court having reviewed the January 30, 2024, Appeal from Justice Court, hereby DOES NOT FIND any error of law and further FINDS sufficient evidence to AFFIRM the January 10, 2024, Small Claims Judgment wherein Plaintiff is awarded nothing against Defendant Michael Metcalfe. The Court finds that the January 10, 2024, Small Claims Judgment from Las Vegas Justice Court is AFFIRMED; The Court further finds that the Appeal Bond, if any, AWARDED to Appellant Kenneth Margolis. It is further ORDERED the District Court case is CLOSED. The Court will prepare a written order. CLERK'S NOTE: A copy of this Minute Order was mailed to: Kenneth Margolis, 7817 Sea Rock Road, Las Vegas, NV, 89128 and Michael Metcalfe, 6117 Minerva Drive, Las Vegas, NV, 89130.//pb/4/10/24. Judge: Ballou, Erika |
|
February 01, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing Doc ID# 2 [2] Notice of Hearing |
|
January 30, 2024 | Docket Event |
Appeal from Lower Court Doc ID# 1 [1] Appeal from Las Vegas Justice Court |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.