Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Sedgwick Cms, United Healthcare Services, Inc., filed a(n) Workers Compensation - Labor and Employment case against Durkee, Amy, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Joanna S. Kishner presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 22, 2023 |
CategoryWorker'S Compensation Appeal |
Last RefreshedFebruary 23, 2024 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeWorkers Compensation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 22, 2024 | Docket Event |
Petition for Judicial Review Oral argument and/or Decision on Petition for Judicial Review Judge: Kishner, Joanna S. |
|
February 12, 2024 | Docket Event |
Reply Doc ID# 21 [21] Petitioners' Reply Brief |
|
January 13, 2024 | Docket Event |
Respondent's Answering Brief Doc ID# 20 [20] Respondent Amy Durkee's Answering Brief |
|
December 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Brief Doc ID# 19 [19] Petitioners' Opening Brief |
|
November 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Order Doc ID# 17 [17] Notice Of Entry Of Order |
|
November 30, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Order Doc ID# 18 [18] Notice of Entry of Order |
|
November 29, 2023 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order Doc ID# 16 [16] Stipulation and Order Setting Briefing Schedule and Petition for Judicial Review and Hearing Date |
|
November 28, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Doc ID# 15 [15] Order Denying Motion for Stay Pending Appeal |
|
November 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Transmittal of Record on Appeal Doc ID# 10 [10] Transmittal of Record on Appeal |
|
November 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Certification of Transmittal Doc ID# 12 [12] Certification of Transmittal |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.