Case Last Refreshed: 2 months ago
Mckee, Ranny Blane, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Christian L. Augustin, against Satter, Austin Shane, Windholz, Rebecca Danielle, represented by Stephen H Rogers, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Bixler, James presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateSeptember 06, 2023 |
CategoryNegligence - Auto |
Last RefreshedFebruary 16, 2024 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 15, 2024 | Docket Event |
Mandatory Rule 16 Conference Present via Zoom Video Conference Application: Plaintiff s Counsel Brian Blankenship, Esq., Defendant s Counsel Jeffrey Ballin, Esq. Jeffrey Ballin, Esq. for Defendants'. Court noted the matter was a Mandatory Rule 16 Conference and a jury demand had not been filed, counsel stated their agreement. Court stated there was a stipulation for discovery cut off of January 02, 2025 and inquired if any parties were in disagreement, counsel advised they agreed. Court advised of the scheduling and trial order to issue which will include dates for a status check that will be set thirty days before an assigned trial, and Calendar Call will be set a week before the trial date. Judge: Bixler, James |
|
February 13, 2024 | Docket Event |
Audiovisual Transmission Equipment Appearance Request Doc ID# 21 [21] Notice of Intent to Appear by Simultaneous Audiovisual Transmission Equipment |
|
February 13, 2024 | Docket Event |
Audiovisual Transmission Equipment Appearance Request Doc ID# 19 [19] Notice of Intent to Appear by Simultaneous Audiovisual or Telephonic Transmission Equipment |
|
February 13, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice of Compliance Doc ID# 20 [20] Notice of Compliance |
|
February 09, 2024 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Doc ID# 18 [18] PROOF OF SERVICE- OFFICER VASILIJE SAGONOVIC |
|
February 05, 2024 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Doc ID# 17 [17] PROOF OF SERVICE- TREVOR STOKES |
|
January 31, 2024 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service Doc ID# 16 [16] PROOF OF SERVICE- KEITH MCCLAIN, JR. |
|
January 29, 2024 | Docket Event |
Mandatory Rule 16 Conference Order Doc ID# 14 [14] Order to Appear for Mandatory 16.1 Discovery Conference |
|
January 29, 2024 | Docket Event |
Notice of Compliance Doc ID# 15 [15] Defendants' Notice of Compliance |
|
January 22, 2024 | Docket Event |
Joint Case Conference Report Doc ID# 13 [13] JOINT CASE CONFERENCE REPORT |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.