Case Last Refreshed: 5 months ago
Carroll, Paul, filed a(n) General Employment - Labor and Employment case represented by Trevor J. Hatfield, against Paradis, Ratana, represented by Anthony L. Martin, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with James M. Bixler presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 03, 2023 |
CategoryEmployment Tort |
Last RefreshedNovember 17, 2023 |
Practice AreaLabor and Employment |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeGeneral Employment |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 11, 2024 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial
Judge: Barisich, Veronica M. |
|
February 29, 2024 | Docket Event |
Calendar Call
Judge: Barisich, Veronica M. |
|
February 06, 2024 | Docket Event |
Pre Trial Conference
Judge: Barisich, Veronica M. |
|
November 16, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion for Order Extending Time Defendant's Motion for an Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (First request) and Application for Order Shortening Time No other parties present. Upon Court's inquiry regarding Defendant's request for an extension, Ms. Tignor requested a 45-day continuance to complete discovery. Further, Ms. Tignor advised that she has had no communication with the Plaintiff since October 26th. COURT ORDERED, Motion GRANTED; Ms. Tignor to prepare and submit the Order. Judge: Thompson, Charles) Defendant's Motion for an Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (First request |
|
November 14, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Non Opposition Doc ID# 23 [23] Defendant's Notice of Plaintiff's Non-Opposition to Motion for an Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (First Request) |
|
November 10, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Order Doc ID# 22 [22] Notice of Entry of Order Granting Defendant's Application for Order Shortening Time |
|
November 09, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order Doc ID# 21 [21] Order Granting Defendant's Application for Order Shortening Time |
|
November 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Motion to Extend Discovery Doc ID# 19 [19] Defendant's Motion for an Extension of Time to Complete Discovery (First Request) & Application for Order Shortening Time (Hearing Requested) |
|
November 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
Clerk's Notice of Hearing Doc ID# 20 [20] Clerk's Notice of Hearing |
|
October 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Order Doc ID# 18 [18] Notice of Entry of Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.