Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Miguel, Victoria, filed a(n) Compromise Of Minor'S Claim case against State Farm Insurance Company, Worthy, Jessica, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Gall, Maria presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGall, Maria Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateJuly 28, 2022 |
CategoryCompromise Of Minor'S Claim |
Last RefreshedAugust 19, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
|
Case Outcome TypeOrder Approving Minor'S Compromise |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 26, 2022 | Docket Event |
Status Check: Blocked Account Vacated - Case Closed Judge: Gall, Maria |
|
September 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Doc ID# 8 [8] Order Showing Proof and Closing Case |
|
September 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
Proof of Establishment of Blocked Trust Account Doc ID# 7 [7] Proof of Establishment of Blocked Trust Account |
|
September 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Doc ID# 6 [6] Order |
|
September 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
Status Check
Judge: Gall, Maria |
|
August 08, 2022 | Docket Event |
Amended Order Compromising Minor's Claim Doc ID# 5 [5] Amended Order Approving Minor's Compromise |
|
August 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
Order Approving Doc ID# 4 [4] Order Approving Minor's Compromise |
|
August 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
Petition for Compromise of Minors Claim Doc ID# 3 [3] Petition for Compromise of Disputed Claim for Minor |
|
August 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
Petition for Compromise of Minors Claim Doc ID# 3 [3] Petition For Compromise of Minors Claim |
|
July 29, 2022 | Docket Event |
Minute Order The Court notes that on July 28, 2022, Petitioner filed a Petition for Compromise of a Minor s Claim [Docket #1]. The Court has also received a proposed Order regarding the same. However, the exhibits to the Petition were not properly redacted. Because of the presence of un-redacted confidential and private information, the Court ORDERS that the Petition be STRICKEN to protect the minor. The Court directs Petitioner to refile its Petition with all confidential and private information properly redacted. This Court requires that the following information be removed from the exhibits to Petitioner s filing: the minor s D.O.B, social security number, and/or any medical chart/file (or other) identification numbers. Where necessary, the minor s date of birth may be indicated in a truncated manner (i.e. xx/xx/2018). Petitioner s submitted proposed Order shall be discarded. Petitioner is directed to amend and refile the Petition, as indicated above, then resubmit the Order to DC19Inbox@clarkcountycourts.us. CLERK S NOTE: A copy of this Minute Order has been electronically served to all registered users on this case in the Eighth Judicial District Court Electronic Filing System. Judge: Gall, Maria |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.