Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Campbell, Timothy, filed a(n) Habeas Corpus - Criminal case represented by Kristina M. Wildeveld, against Johnson, Calvin, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Carli L. Kierny presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeCarli L. Kierny Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateMay 25, 2022 |
CategoryWrit Of Habeas Corpus |
Last RefreshedDecember 07, 2023 |
Practice AreaCriminal |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeHabeas Corpus |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Status Check
Judge: Kierny, Carli |
|
November 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Evidentiary Hearing Vacated - per Law Clerk Judge: Kierny, Carli |
|
November 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Evidentiary Hearing
Judge: Kierny, Carli |
|
September 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
Order for Production of Inmate Doc ID# 16 [16] Order for Production of Inmate |
|
September 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Argument COURT ORDERED, MATTER SET FOR Evidentiary Hearing and directed the State to prepare the transport order. NDC 11/17/23 9:00 AM EVIDENTIARY HEARING Judge: Kierny, Carli |
|
September 13, 2023 | Docket Event |
Argument
Judge: Kierny, Carli |
|
October 24, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion Vacated - Previously Decided Judge: Kierny, Carli |
|
October 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
Minute Order This matter is before the Court for Petitioner's Motion to Extend Supplemental Briefing Schedule. The Court hereby GRANTS the motion and sets the following due dates: Petitioner's Supplemental Response is now due 1/12/23. The State shall have until 3/13/23 to file a supplemental opposition, if it desires. Petitioner will then have 15 days for a Supplemental Reply, if Petitioner desires, which shall be due 3/28/23. The matter will be set for hearing 4/5/23 @ 9:30 AM. This minute order hereby VACATES the motion set for 10/24/22. CLERK'S NOTE: This Minute Order was electronically served by Courtroom Clerk, Jill Chambers, to all registered parties for Odyssey File & Serve. jmc 10/12/22 Judge: Kierny, Carli |
|
September 12, 2022 | Docket Event |
Clerk's Notice of Hearing Doc ID# 15 [15] Notice of Hearing |
|
September 09, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion to Extend Doc ID# 14 [14] Motion to Extend Briefing Schedule |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.