Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) Other Business Court Matters case in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJune 28, 2021 |
CategoryOther Business Court Matters |
Last RefreshedJuly 27, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Opposition and Countermotion Plaintiff T1 Payments' Opposition to Lisa Kaye's Motion to Quash Service and Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction; and Counter-Motion to Deem "Drop Service" Effective and/or for Permission to Serve by E-Mail Judge: Gonzalez, Elizabeth |
|
July 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion Lisa Kaye's Motion : (1) to Qyash Service Pursuant to NRCP 12(B)(4); and (2) to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction Pursuant to NRCP 12(b)(2), and Request for order Shortening Time Judge: Gonzalez, Elizabeth) Lisa Kaye's Motion : (1) to Qyash Service Pursuant to NRCP 12(B)(4); and (2) to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction Pursuant to NRCP 12(b)(2 |
|
July 26, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion T1 Payments' Injucntion Motion Judge: Gonzalez, Elizabeth |
|
July 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Reply in Support Doc ID# 19 [19] Reply in Support of Motion for Temporary Restraining Order and Preliminary Injunction on Ex Parte Order Shortening Time |
|
July 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Reply Doc ID# 18 [18] Reply In Support of Lisa Kaye's Motion: (1) To Quash Service Pursuant to NRCP 12(b)(4); and (2) To Dismiss for Lack Of Personal Jurisdication Pursuant to NRCP 12(b)(2) |
|
July 23, 2021 | Docket Event |
Errata Doc ID# 20 [20] Errata to Reply in Support of Lisa Kaye's Motion: (1) to Quash Service Pursuant to NRCP 12(b)(4); and (2) to Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction Pursuant to NRCP 12(b)(2) |
|
July 20, 2021 | Docket Event |
Opposition and Countermotion Doc ID# 17 [17] Plaintiff T1 Payments' Opposition to Lisa Kaye's Motion to Quash Service and Dismiss for Lack of Personal Jurisdiction; and Counter-Motion to Deem "Drop Service" Effective and/or for Permission to Serve by E-Mail |
|
July 16, 2021 | Docket Event |
Motion
Judge: Gonzalez, Elizabeth |
|
July 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry Doc ID# 16 [16] Notice of Entry of Stipulation and Order Continuing the Temporary Restraining Order and Resetting the Hearing on All Pending Motions |
|
July 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order Doc ID# 15 [15] Stipulation and Order continuing the Temporary Restraining Order and Resetting the Hearing on all Pending Motions |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.