Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Yahn, Anne, filed a(n) Automobile - Torts case represented by Michael C Kane, against Whittlesea Blue Cab Company, represented by Mark Elton Trafton, in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts with Sturman, Gloria presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 31, 2021 |
CategoryNegligence - Auto |
Last RefreshedAugust 19, 2023 |
Practice AreaTorts |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeAutomobile |
Case Outcome TypeOrder Of Dismissal With Prejudice |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial Vacated - per Stipulation and Order Judge: Sturman, Gloria |
|
April 17, 2023 | Docket Event |
Jury Trial
Judge: Sturman, Gloria |
|
April 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Calendar Call Vacated - per Stipulation and Order Judge: Sturman, Gloria |
|
April 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
Calendar Call
Judge: Sturman, Gloria |
|
July 19, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Order Doc ID# 35 [35] Notice of Entry of Order |
|
June 28, 2022 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order for Dismissal With Prejudice Doc ID# 34 [34] Stipulation and Order to Dismiss Defendants with Prejudice |
|
June 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing Doc ID# 33 [33] Instructions for Bluejeans |
|
May 17, 2022 | Docket Event | Clerk's Refund Request Doc ID# 32 | |
March 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion for Summary Judgment Appearances via BlueJeans video conference: Brandon Born, Esq. Jeffrey Orr, Esq. Mark Trafton, Esq. Argument by Mr. Orr regarding Plaintiff not opposing to dismissing Palm s from case. Mr. Trafton argued the statement plaintiff made in her Interrogatory regarding Palms. Mr. Trafton requested to have the Plaintiffs deposition before they make the ruling of releasing Palms. Colloquy regarding discovery schedule within 60 days. There being agreement, COURT ORDERED, Motion CONTINUED in 90 days. Court directed Mr. Trafton to prepare Order to include dates. CONTINUED TO: June 27, 2022 at 9:30 AM Judge: Sturman, Gloria |
|
March 22, 2022 | Docket Event |
Motion for Summary Judgment Defendant, FP Holdings, L.P.'S Motion for Summary Judgment Judge: Sturman, Gloria |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.