Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
filed a(n) General Property - Property case in the jurisdiction of Clark County, NV, . Clark County, NV Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 31, 2021 |
CategoryOther Real Property |
Last RefreshedFebruary 17, 2022 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationClark County, NV |
Matter TypeGeneral Property |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 01, 2022 | Docket Event |
Bench Trial Vacated - per Stipulation and Order Judge: s Escobar, Adriana, Escobar, Adriana |
|
July 13, 2022 | Docket Event |
Calendar Call Vacated - per Stipulation and Order Judge: Escobar, Adriana |
|
March 02, 2022 | Docket Event |
STATUS CHECK: Scheduled Settlement Conference
Judge: Escobar, Adriana |
|
February 16, 2022 | Docket Event |
Settlement Conference Notice of Scheduling Settlement Conference |
|
January 20, 2022 | Docket Event |
Notice of Hearing Doc ID# 25 [25] Notice of Scheduling Settlement Conference |
|
December 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Stipulation and Order to Extend Discovery Deadlines Doc ID# 23 [23] Stipulation and Order to Continue Discovery Deadlines and Trial (First Request) |
|
December 21, 2021 | Docket Event |
Notice of Entry of Stipulation and Order Doc ID# 24 [24] Notice of Entry of Stipulation and Order to Continue Discovery Deadlines and Trial (First Request) |
|
October 15, 2021 | Docket Event |
Scheduling and Trial Order Doc ID# 22 [22] Scheduling Order and Order Setting Civil Bench Trial and Calendar Call |
|
October 07, 2021 | Docket Event |
Mandatory Rule 16 Conference
Judge: Escobar, Adriana |
|
September 30, 2021 | Docket Event |
Opposition and Countermotion Vacated - per Stipulation and Order Judge: Escobar, Adriana) Vacated - per Stipulation and Order[16] Opposition to Motion for Summary Judgment; Countermotion For Partial Summary Judgment; and NRCP 56(d |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.